AZ HB2284 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - House majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - House majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriation; regional park; Yavapai county
Title
Appropriation; regional park; Yavapai county
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Land & Agriculture Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Land & Agriculture Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-24 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-24 | House | House consent calendar |
2020-02-24 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-19 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-2-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-06 | House | House LAG Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-27 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned to House LAG Committee |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |