AZ HB2281 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-29 - House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-29 - House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Solar royalties fund; county residents
Title
Solar royalties fund; county residents
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House - Motion Motion by Representative Biasiucci that pursuant to House Rule 12(P), HB2281 be calendared for an Additional Committee of the Whole for purposes of further amending. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House - Motion Motion by Representative Biasiucci that pursuant to House Rule 12(P), HB2281 be calendared for an Additional Committee of the Whole for purposes of further amending. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | House | House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-29 | House | House refer to additional Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-13 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-13 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-12 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-02-12 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-1-0-0-0-0) |
2024-01-30 | House | House NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0) |
2024-01-17 | House | House read second time |
2024-01-16 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | Assigned to House NREW Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Counties - Title 11
County Board Of Supervisors
County Residents
County Solar Royalties Fund
Solar Royalties Fund
County Board Of Supervisors
County Residents
County Solar Royalties Fund
Solar Royalties Fund