AZ HB2280 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Chapter 60
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Chapter 60
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of revenue; electronic filing
Title
Department of revenue; electronic filing
Sponsors
Sen. Don Shooter [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | Senate | Chapter 60 |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-03-23 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (56-0-4-0) |
2017-03-23 | House | House concurs |
2017-03-23 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2017-03-23 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2017-03-21 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-02-23 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2017-02-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2017-02-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-15 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2017-01-18 | House | House read second time |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2017-01-17 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Amusements And Sports
Department Of Administration
Department Of Revenue
Electronic Filings
Internal Revenue Service
Tax Returns
Taxation
Tpt
Transaction Privilege Tax
Department Of Administration
Department Of Revenue
Electronic Filings
Internal Revenue Service
Tax Returns
Taxation
Tpt
Transaction Privilege Tax
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 742 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 1108 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 1125 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 1126 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 1127 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 1129 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 13002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 2003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 2075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 3053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 3352 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 3353 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 3354 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 3355 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 3462 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5014 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5017 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1073.01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 222 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 323 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 407 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |