AZ HB2274 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Chapter 329
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriation; stipend; kinship foster care

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriation; stipend; kinship foster care

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-06-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-06-29SenateChapter 329
2022-06-29SenateGovernor Signed
2022-06-24SenateTransmitted to Governor
2022-06-24HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (50-3-7-0)
2022-06-23HouseHouse concurs
2022-06-23HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2022-06-23HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2022-06-23HouseTransmit to House
2022-06-23SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (26-2-2-0)
2022-06-22SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2022-06-22SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2022-06-22SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2022-06-20SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2022-03-22SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-1-0)
2022-03-07SenateSenate read second time
2022-03-03SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2022-03-03SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2022-03-03SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2022-02-25SenateTransmit to Senate
2022-02-24HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (52-7-1-0)
2022-02-22HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2022-02-22HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2022-02-22HouseHouse consent calendar
2022-02-22HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
2022-02-09HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-1-1-0-0-0)
2022-02-07HouseHouse HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2022-01-19HouseHouse read second time
2022-01-18HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2022-01-18HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2022-01-18HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2022-01-18HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
49408Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/76741
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/2r/bills/hb2274p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/2r/bills/hb2274h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/2r/bills/hb2274s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/2r/laws/0329.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/2R/adopted/S.2274FLOORGOWAN.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/493267
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/493529
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/494063
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/495876
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/497387
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/500046
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/499952
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/500184
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/500223
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/500331
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76741&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76741&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76741&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76741&billStatusActionId=209243&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76741&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76741&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#4
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76741&billStatusActionId=211853&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76741&billStatusActionId=211900&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76741&billStatusActionId=211991&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76741&billStatusActionId=212082&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback