AZ HB2273 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-14 - Chapter 137
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Transportation network company vehicles; inspections

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation network company vehicles; inspections

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-04-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-14SenateChapter 137
2022-04-14SenateGovernor Signed
2022-04-11SenateTransmitted to Governor
2022-04-11HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (39-18-3-0)
2022-04-11HouseHouse concurs
2022-04-07HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2022-04-07HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2022-04-04HouseTransmit to House
2022-04-04SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (21-5-4-0)
2022-03-30SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2022-03-15SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2022-03-08SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2022-03-07SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2022-02-28SenateSenate TAT Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-2-0)
2022-02-21SenateSenate read second time
2022-02-17SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2022-02-17SenateAssigned to Senate TAT Committee
2022-02-17SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2022-02-15SenateTransmit to Senate
2022-02-15HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (55-4-1-0)
2022-02-15HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2022-02-01HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2022-02-01HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2022-01-31HouseHouse Committee of the Whole consent calendar
2022-01-31HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2022-01-25HouseHouse COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0)
2022-01-19HouseHouse read second time
2022-01-18HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2022-01-18HouseAssigned to House COM Committee
2022-01-18HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
289555Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/76738
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/2r/bills/hb2273p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/2r/bills/hb2273h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/2r/bills/hb2273s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/2r/laws/0137.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/2R/proposed/H.2273WENINGER1.DOCX.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/2R/adopted/H.2273COMMERCE.DOCX.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/2R/proposed/S.2273PACE.DOCX.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/2R/adopted/S.2273TAT.DOCX.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/491954
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/492244
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/495158
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/495765
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/496183
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/498394
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/498544
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76738&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76738&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76738&billStatusActionId=208100&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76738&billStatusActionId=208122&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76738&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76738&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76738&billStatusActionId=210754&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76738&billStatusActionId=210803&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76738&billStatusActionId=210897&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76738&billStatusActionId=210895&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback