AZ HB2273 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Note: Legislation replaced by SB1003

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-12 - House majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Industrial hemp; licensing; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Industrial hemp; licensing; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House Land & Agriculture Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-12HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-12HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-11HouseHouse consent calendar
2019-02-11HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-01-28HouseHouse RA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-01-24HouseHouse LAG Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-01-23HouseHouse read second time
2019-01-22HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-01-22HouseAssigned to House RA Committee
2019-01-22HouseAssigned to House LAG Committee
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Same As/Similar To

SB1003 (Replaced by) 2019-02-20 - Chapter 5

Subjects


Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback