AZ HB2272 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Postelection equipment testing
Title
Postelection equipment testing
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Thorpe [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2020-02-24 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-24 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-24 | House | House consent calendar |
2020-02-24 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-18 | House | House ELECT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-1-0-0) |
2020-02-04 | House | House read second time |
2020-02-03 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-02-03 | House | Assigned to House ELECT Committee |
2020-02-03 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |