AZ HB2272 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Technical correction; overtaking bicycles
Title
Technical correction; overtaking bicycles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | Governor Signed | |
2012-03-28 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-03-28 | House final reading , voting: (59-0-1-0) | |
2012-03-28 | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2012-03-27 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-27 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-26 | Transmit to House | |
2012-03-26 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) | |
2012-03-21 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-03-19 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-19 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-19 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended | |
2012-03-07 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-14 | Senate CE Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-0-1-0) | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Senate CE Committee | |
2012-03-08 | Senate read second time | |
2012-03-07 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Assigned to Senate CE Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2012-03-07 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-03-06 | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-1-0-0) | |
2012-03-05 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-03-01 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-29 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-28 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-2-0) | |
2012-02-13 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-16 | House TRANS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-02-14 | Referred to House TRANS Committee | |
2012-02-14 | House read second time | |
2012-02-13 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-13 | Assigned to House TRANS Committee | |
2012-02-13 | Introduced in House and read first time |