AZ HB2270 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-3-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriations; DPS; remote housing

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriations; DPS; remote housing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-13SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-3-0)
2018-03-05SenateSenate COMPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-0-0)
2018-02-21SenateSenate read second time
2018-02-20SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-20SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-20SenateAssigned to Senate COMPS Committee
2018-02-20SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2018-02-20SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-02-09SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-08HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-1-0)
2018-02-08HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-06HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-06HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-05HouseHouse Committee of the Whole consent calendar
2018-02-05HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2018-01-31HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (12-0-0-1-0-0)
2018-01-18HouseHouse read second time
2018-01-17HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-17HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2018-01-17HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70034
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2270p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2270h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/h.2270appropriations.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70034&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70034&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70034&billStatusActionId=180577&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70034&billStatusActionId=180580&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70034&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70034&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2

Bill Comments

feedback