AZ HB2269 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Chapter 229
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Chapter 229
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Victims' rights; requirements; monetary judgments
Title
Victims' rights; requirements; monetary judgments
Sponsors
Rep. Maria Syms [R] | Rep. Brenda Barton [R] | Rep. Russell Bowers [R] | Rep. David Cook [R] |
Rep. Drew John [R] | Sen. Anthony Kern [R] | Sen. Vince Leach [R] | Rep. Darin Mitchell [R] |
Rep. Becky Nutt [R] | Rep. Kevin Payne [R] | Rep. Jesus Rubalcava [D] | Sen. Karen Fann [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Motion Representative Syms motion to rescind concurence and appoint a Free Conference Committee. motion passed by v/v (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Motion Representative Syms motion to rescind concurence and appoint a Free Conference Committee. motion passed by v/v (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Chapter 229 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-04-20 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (56-0-3-0) |
2017-04-20 | House | House Conference adopted |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conference adopted |
2017-04-18 | House | House Conference caucus date |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Senate Conference caucus date |
2017-04-12 | House | House Conference report: That the House accept the Senate amendments with exceptions and the bill be further amended. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senate Conference members: BURGES, DALESSANDRO, WORSLEY |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senate Conference appointed |
2017-03-30 | House | House Conference members: SYMS, ENGEL, FINCHEM |
2017-03-30 | House | House Conference appointed |
2017-03-30 | House | House miscellaneous motion: Representative Syms motion to rescind concurence and appoint a Free Conference Committee. motion passed by v/v |
2017-03-23 | House | House concurs |
2017-03-23 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2017-03-23 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2017-03-21 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-02-21 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2017-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-15 | House | House JPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-01-19 | House | House read second time |
2017-01-18 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-01-18 | House | Assigned to House JPS Committee |
2017-01-18 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Board Of Executive Clemency
Boards, Commissions And Committees -- Current
Children
Criminal Code
Department Of Corrections
Victims' Rights
Boards, Commissions And Committees -- Current
Children
Criminal Code
Department Of Corrections
Victims' Rights
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 4402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 4405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 4407 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 4408 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 4415 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 4428 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 805 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 806 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 810 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
22 | 116 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 2407 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 386 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 386.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 387 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 396 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 407 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 413 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 415 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |