AZ HB2267 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Captive insurance; fund

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Captive insurance; fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-08SenateGovernor Signed
2017-05-04SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-05-04HouseTransmit to House
2017-05-04SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2017-05-04SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2017-04-25SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-04-25SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-04-24SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-03-22SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-2-0)
2017-02-21SenateSenate read second time
2017-02-20SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-02-20SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2017-02-20SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2017-02-10SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-02-09HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (57-1-2-0)
2017-02-07HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-07HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-06HouseHouse consent calendar
2017-02-06HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
2017-01-30HouseHouse BI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2017-01-18HouseHouse read second time
2017-01-17HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-01-17HouseAssigned to House BI Committee
2017-01-17HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
201098.18Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/68784
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2267p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2267h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/laws/0281.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68784&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68784&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68784&billStatusActionId=174561&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68784&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68784&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68784&billStatusActionId=177364&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68784&billStatusActionId=177373&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback