AZ HB2267 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-09 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-09 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Burial; instructions
Title
Burial; instructions
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Forese [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Energy and Military Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate CEM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-0-3-0) |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate CEM Committee |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate CEM Committee |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2014-02-24 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-02-24 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (56-3-1-0) |
2014-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-02-18 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-18 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-17 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) |
2014-01-28 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-1-0-0-0) |
2014-01-29 | House | Referred to House COM Committee |
2014-01-29 | House | House read second time |
2014-01-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-01-28 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2014-01-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |