AZ HB2265 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Community colleges; STEM funding
Title
Community colleges; STEM funding
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Forese [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House Higher Education and Workforce Development Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House Higher Education and Workforce Development Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-19 | Governor Signed | |
2013-06-13 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-3-0) |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Senate ED Committee |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2013-02-25 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2013-02-25 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2013-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2013-02-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-18 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-02-13 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-0-0-0-0) |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to House APPROP Committee |
2013-02-06 | House | House HEWD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) |
2013-01-23 | House | Referred to House HEWD Committee |
2013-01-23 | House | House read second time |
2013-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-01-22 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2013-01-22 | House | Assigned to House HEWD Committee |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |