AZ HB2263 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - House APPROP Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - House APPROP Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations; Lake Havasu City; bridge
Title
Appropriations; Lake Havasu City; bridge
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-10 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-03 | House | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-0-0-1-0-0) |
2021-01-26 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-25 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-25 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2021-01-25 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |