AZ HB2263 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-20 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Landlord tenant; security deposits

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Landlord tenant; security deposits

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-20 Governor Vetoed
2018-04-19 Transmitted to Governor
2018-04-18HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (50-9-1-0)
2018-04-18HouseHouse concurs
2018-04-17HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2018-04-17HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2018-04-11HouseTransmit to House
2018-04-11SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0)
2018-04-09SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-03-13SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-13SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-12SenateSenate consent calendar
2018-03-12SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-03-05SenateSenate COMPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0)
2018-02-21SenateSenate read second time
2018-02-20SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-20SenateAssigned to Senate COMPS Committee
2018-02-20SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-02-15SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-15HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (36-23-1-0)
2018-02-14HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-06HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-06HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-05HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2018-01-30HouseHouse COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0)
2018-01-18HouseHouse read second time
2018-01-17HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-17HouseAssigned to House COM Committee
2018-01-17HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
331321Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70027
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2263p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2263h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2263s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.2263norgaard.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/h.2263commerce.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.2263griffin0832.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.2263smith0431.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70027&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70027&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70027&billStatusActionId=180678&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70027&billStatusActionId=180856&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70027&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70027&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70027&billStatusActionId=183088&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70027&billStatusActionId=183218&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70027&billStatusActionId=183317&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70027&billStatusActionId=183325&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback