AZ HB2262 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Legacy plates; plate reissuance; reflectivity

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legacy plates; plate reissuance; reflectivity

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-31SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-03-24SenateSenate TAT Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-02-22SenateSenate read second time
2021-02-18SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-02-18SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2021-02-18SenateAssigned to Senate TAT Committee
2021-02-18SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2021-02-12SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-02-11HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (49-10-1-0)
2021-02-11HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2021-02-09HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-09HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-08HouseHouse consent calendar
2021-02-08HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-03HouseHouse TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-1-1-1-0-0)
2021-01-26HouseHouse read second time
2021-01-25HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-01-25HouseAssigned to House TRANS Committee
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
282351Amended CodeSee Bill Text
282403Amended CodeSee Bill Text
282469New CodeSee Bill Text
286501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
286991Amended CodeSee Bill Text
286993Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/74721
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2262p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2262h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/s.2262pace.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/s.22620302.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/s.2262kerr.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/482428
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/483182
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/483900
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487423
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487430
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/488202
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74721&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74721&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74721&billStatusActionId=200500&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74721&billStatusActionId=200612&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74721&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74721&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3

Bill Comments 750

feedback