AZ HB2262 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Chapter 235
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Condominiums; termination; appraisals

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Condominiums; termination; appraisals

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-17SenateChapter 235
2018-04-17SenateGovernor Signed
2018-04-11SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-04-11HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (57-0-3-0)
2018-04-11HouseHouse concurs
2018-04-10HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2018-04-10HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2018-04-05HouseTransmit to House
2018-04-05SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0)
2018-04-03SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-03-27SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-27SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-26SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-03-21SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2018-03-08SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2018-02-21SenateSenate read second time
2018-02-20SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-20SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-02-14SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-14HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (58-1-1-0)
2018-02-14HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-06HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-06HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-05HouseHouse Committee of the Whole consent calendar
2018-02-05HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2018-01-30HouseHouse COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2018-01-18HouseHouse read second time
2018-01-17HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-17HouseAssigned to House COM Committee
2018-01-17HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
331228Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70026
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2262p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2262h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2262s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0235.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.2262toma.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/h.2262commerce.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.22620829.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.2262gov.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70026&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70026&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70026&billStatusActionId=180677&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70026&billStatusActionId=180685&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70026&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70026&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70026&billStatusActionId=182874&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70026&billStatusActionId=183013&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70026&billStatusActionId=183193&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70026&billStatusActionId=183226&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback