AZ HB2260 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Vetoed on April 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-20 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Commercial license; defensive driving school

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commercial license; defensive driving school

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-17 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-20 Governor Vetoed
2018-04-17 Transmitted to Governor
2018-04-17HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (58-0-2-0)
2018-04-17HouseHouse concurs
2018-04-12HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2018-04-12HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2018-04-09HouseTransmit to House
2018-04-09SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0)
2018-04-05SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-03-06SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-06SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-05SenateSenate consent calendar
2018-03-05SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-02-27SenateSenate TRANSIT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2018-02-21SenateSenate read second time
2018-02-20SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-20SenateAssigned to Senate TRANSIT Committee
2018-02-20SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-02-12SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-12HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-1-0)
2018-02-12HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-06HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-06HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-05HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-02-05HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2018-01-31HouseHouse TI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2018-01-24HouseHouse read second time
2018-01-23HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-23HouseAssigned to House TI Committee
2018-01-23HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
283392Amended CodeSee Bill Text
283394Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70024
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2260p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2260h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2260s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.2260gray1154.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70024&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70024&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70024&billStatusActionId=180611&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70024&billStatusActionId=180627&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70024&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70024&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70024&billStatusActionId=183001&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70024&billStatusActionId=183097&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70024&billStatusActionId=183295&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70024&billStatusActionId=183301&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback