AZ HB2257 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Chapter 234
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Chapter 234
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Radiation regulatory boards; repeal; DHS
Title
Radiation regulatory boards; repeal; DHS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House Health Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House Health Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Senate | Chapter 234 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-04-11 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (57-0-3-0) |
2018-04-11 | House | House concurs |
2018-04-10 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2018-04-10 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2018-04-04 | House | Transmit to House |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-02-06 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-1-0) |
2018-01-30 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-01-30 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-01-29 | House | House consent calendar |
2018-01-29 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0) |
2018-01-18 | House | House HEALTH Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2018-01-17 | House | House read second time |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned to House HEALTH Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Department Of Health Services
Power - Title 30
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Radiation Regulatory Board
Power - Title 30
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Radiation Regulatory Board
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 651 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
30 | 653 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
30 | 654 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
30 | 655 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
30 | 658 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
30 | 671 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
30 | 672 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
30 | 672.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
30 | 681 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
30 | 682 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
30 | 685 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
30 | 686 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
30 | 687 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
30 | 688 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
31 | 241 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 2801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 2802 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 2803 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 2804 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 2805 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 2812 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 2813 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 2814 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 2815 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 2816 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 2818 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 2819 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 2821 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 2823 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 2824 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 2825 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 2841 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 414 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3018.04 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3018.23 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |