AZ HB2249 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Replaces legislation SB1413
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Chapter 33
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Chapter 33
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State lands; leases; renewal applications
Title
State lands; leases; renewal applications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Motion HB 2249 substituted for SB 1413. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (DISC/HELD) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Motion HB 2249 substituted for SB 1413. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (DISC/HELD) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | Senate | Chapter 33 |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-02-16 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Senate miscellaneous motion: HB 2249 substituted for SB 1413. Motion carried. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-02-11 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2021-02-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2021-02-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2021-02-02 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-02 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-01 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-02-01 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-21 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-21 | House | House NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-20 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-20 | House | Assigned to House NREW Committee |
2021-01-20 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
SB1413 (Replaces) 2021-02-09 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass