AZ HB2248 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Corporation commission; electric generation resources

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Corporation commission; electric generation resources

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (DISC/HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-02-23HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2021-02-09HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-09HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-08HouseHouse consent calendar
2021-02-08HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0)
2021-01-26HouseHouse NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0)
2021-01-21HouseHouse read second time
2021-01-20HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-01-20HouseAssigned to House NREW Committee
2021-01-20HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40213New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/74680
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2248p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2248h.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/480619
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/481851
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/484095
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/485601
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74680&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74680&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74680&billStatusActionId=201242&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74680&billStatusActionId=201604&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback