AZ HB2245 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-06 - sit Cow Action:
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-06 - sit Cow Action:
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Schools; access to property
Title
Schools; access to property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 10 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-17 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-06 | sit Cow Action: | |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (10-18-2-0) |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Senate GOV Committee |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate CWD Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-0-2-0) |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Senate CWD Committee |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-1-1-0) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate ED Committee |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate CWD Committee |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2016-02-25 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-02-24 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (48-11-1-0) |
2016-02-08 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2016-02-02 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-02 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-01 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2016-01-21 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-01-27 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to House ED Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | House read second time |
2016-01-21 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-01-21 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2016-01-21 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |