AZ HB2244 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-12 - Senate motion to reconsider third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-12 - Senate motion to reconsider third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Misrepresenting; food products
Title
Misrepresenting; food products
Sponsors
Rep. Quang Nguyen [R] | Rep. Leo Biasiucci [R] | Rep. Selina Bliss [R] | Rep. Lupe Diaz [R] |
Rep. John Gillette [R] | Rep. Matt Gress [R] | Rep. David Livingston [R] | Rep. Julie Willoughby [R] |
Rep. Justin Wilmeth [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-12 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 8 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 8 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-12 | Senate | Senate motion to reconsider third reading |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (8-19-3-0) |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Senate additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate motion to reconsider third reading |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (15-15-0-0) |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (5-2-0-0) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-02-01 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (35-20-1-0) |
2024-01-30 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-01-30 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-01-29 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-01-29 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-1-0-0-0) |
2024-01-22 | House | House LARA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0) |
2024-01-17 | House | House read second time |
2024-01-16 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | Assigned to House LARA Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Civil Penalty
Definitions (s)
Fish (s)
Food Products
Meat (s)
Misbranding
Misrepresenting
Poultry (s)
Products Not Derived From Slaughter (s)
Prohibition (s)
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Pure Food Control
Violation (s)
Definitions (s)
Fish (s)
Food Products
Meat (s)
Misbranding
Misrepresenting
Poultry (s)
Products Not Derived From Slaughter (s)
Prohibition (s)
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Pure Food Control
Violation (s)