AZ HB2240 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-10 - Chapter 304
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-10 - Chapter 304
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
National guard members; tuition waivers
Title
National guard members; tuition waivers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-10 | Chapter 304 | |
2015-04-10 | Governor Signed | |
2015-04-06 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2015-04-02 | House | House final reading , voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2015-04-02 | House | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2015-04-02 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-04-02 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-1-3-0) |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate PSMT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-0) |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate PSMT Committee |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Senate PSMT Committee |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2015-03-03 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-03-03 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2015-02-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-02-25 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-25 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-16 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Withdrawn |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to House APPROP Committee |
2015-02-05 | House | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to House MAPS Committee |
2015-02-02 | House | House read second time |
2015-01-29 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-01-29 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2015-01-29 | House | Assigned to House MAPS Committee |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |