AZ HB2236 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Chapter 259
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Chapter 259
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Voter registration; request required
Title
Voter registration; request required
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Motion Representative Toma motioned that pursuant to House Rule 12(O) HB 2236 be referred for an additional Committee of the Whole for purposes of further amending. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Motion (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Motion Representative Toma motioned that pursuant to House Rule 12(O) HB 2236 be referred for an additional Committee of the Whole for purposes of further amending. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Motion (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Senate | Chapter 259 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-05-23 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-13-1-0) |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-02-24 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-1-0) |
2022-02-24 | House | House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-24 | House | House refer to additional Committee of the Whole |
2022-02-22 | House | House motion to reconsider third reading |
2022-02-22 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (29-30-1-0) |
2022-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2022-02-08 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-08 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-07 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-02-07 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-02 | House | House GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-6-0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-24 | House | House read second time |
2022-01-20 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-01-20 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2022-01-20 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Qualification Of Electors
Registration Of Electors
Requests
Voter Registration
Qualification Of Electors
Registration Of Electors
Requests
Voter Registration