AZ HB2235 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - House third reading FAILED voting: (30-30-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - House third reading FAILED voting: (30-30-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Record of proceedings; certified reporter
Title
Record of proceedings; certified reporter
Sponsors
Rep. John Allen [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (30-30-0-0) |
2020-03-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2020-02-24 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-24 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-24 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-19 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-29 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-01-13 | House | Prefile |