AZ HB2231 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - House third reading FAILED voting: (30-29-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - House third reading FAILED voting: (30-29-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Nonhealth professions; occupations; regulations
Title
Nonhealth professions; occupations; regulations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (30-29-1-0) |
2019-02-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-02-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2019-02-12 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-12 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-11 | House | House consent calendar |
2019-02-11 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-05 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-04 | House | House RA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0-0-0) |
2019-01-29 | House | House read second time |
2019-01-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | Assigned to House RA Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Committee Of Reference
Definitions
Occupational Licensing Regulation
Occupational Regulation
State Government - Title 41
Definitions
Occupational Licensing Regulation
Occupational Regulation
State Government - Title 41
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 2954 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3501 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3502 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3506 | New Code | See Bill Text |