AZ HB2229 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - House HHS Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

DCS; reunification; unannounced home visits

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DCS; reunification; unannounced home visits

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-13 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20HouseHouse HHS Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-01-21HouseHouse read second time
2020-01-16HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-01-16HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2020-01-16HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2020-01-13HousePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8828New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback