AZ HB2227 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-04 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-1-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-04 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-1-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Eligible organizations; registration; childcare monies
Title
Eligible organizations; registration; childcare monies
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Gress [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DISC/HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DISC/HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-04 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-1-0-0) |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2023-03-07 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (36-24-0-0) |
2023-03-01 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-02-27 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-27 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-27 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-13 | House | House HHS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-2-0-0-0-0) |
2023-01-18 | House | House read second time |
2023-01-17 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-01-17 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2023-01-17 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Child Care Development Fund Plan
Child Care Monies
Department Of Economic Security (des)
Des (see Also: Department Of Economic Security)
Eligible Organizations
Child Care Monies
Department Of Economic Security (des)
Des (see Also: Department Of Economic Security)
Eligible Organizations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 883.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 884 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
46 | 801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |