AZ HB2217 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-09 - Referred to House APPROP Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-09 - Referred to House APPROP Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Job training fund; vocational rehabilitation
Title
Job training fund; vocational rehabilitation
Sponsors
Rep. Stefanie Mach [D] | Sen. Lela Alston [D] | Sen. Kate Brophy McGee [R] | Rep. Mark Cardenas [D] |
Sen. Karen Fann [R] | Sen. Juan Mendez [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-02 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House Children and Family Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House Children and Family Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-09 | House | Referred to House APPROP Committee |
2015-02-09 | House | House CFA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-0-1-0) |
2015-02-04 | House | Referred to House CFA Committee |
2015-02-04 | House | House read second time |
2015-02-03 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Assigned to House CFA Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |