AZ HB2214 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Chapter 278
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Chapter 278
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax subtraction; ADA retrofits
Title
Income tax subtraction; ADA retrofits
Sponsors
Sen. Vince Leach [R] | Rep. Regina Cobb [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | Senate | Chapter 278 |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-05-04 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-02-13 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-1-1-0) |
2017-02-09 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-07 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-07 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2017-02-06 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2017-02-01 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-01-18 | House | House read second time |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2017-01-17 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 1021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1024 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1122 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1124 | New Code | See Bill Text |