AZ HB2208 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibition; photo radar
Title
Prohibition; photo radar
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate TRANSIT Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TRANSIT Committee |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-02-08 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-27-1-0) |
2018-01-31 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2018-01-30 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-01-30 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-01-29 | House | House consent calendar |
2018-01-29 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0) |
2018-01-24 | House | House JPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0) |
2018-01-18 | House | House read second time |
2018-01-17 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-01-17 | House | Assigned to House JPS Committee |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 1201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 1202 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 1203 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 1204 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 1205 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 1206 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 1602 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 601 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 627 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |