AZ HB2208 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Technical correction; air pollution; orders
Title
Technical correction; air pollution; orders
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Transportation Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House Environment Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Transportation Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House Environment Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-25 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-20 | House final reading , voting: (59-0-1-0) | |
2011-04-20 | House Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-20 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-20 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-20 | Transmit to House | |
2011-04-19 | Senate third reading , voting: (30-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-11 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-03-22 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-22 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-21 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-03-02 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-14 | Senate NRT Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-0-1-0) | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Senate NRT Committee | |
2011-03-03 | Senate read second time | |
2011-03-02 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-02 | Assigned to Senate NRT Committee | |
2011-03-02 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-03-01 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-03-01 | House third reading , voting: (53-4-3-0) | |
2011-02-28 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-24 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-24 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-23 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2011-02-15 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-17 | House ENV Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-0-0-2-0) | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to House ENV Committee | |
2011-02-16 | House read second time | |
2011-02-15 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-15 | Assigned to House ENV Committee | |
2011-02-15 | Introduced in House and read first time |