AZ HB2206 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - House ED Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Schools; dress codes; graduation ceremonies

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; dress codes; graduation ceremonies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-10 - House - House Education Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10HouseHouse ED Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-02-06HouseHouse read second time
2020-02-05HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-02-05HouseAssigned to House ED Committee
2020-02-05HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2020-01-13HousePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15348New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback