AZ HB2201 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-19 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-19 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Partisan offices; cities; towns
Title
Partisan offices; cities; towns
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Carroll [R] | Rep. Leo Biasiucci [R] | Rep. Walter Blackman [R] | Sen. Shawnna Bolick [R] |
Rep. Kevin Payne [R] | Rep. Ben Toma [R] | Rep. David Livingston [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-18 | House | House consent calendar |
2019-02-18 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-05 | House | House ELECT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0) |
2019-01-29 | House | House read second time |
2019-01-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | Assigned to House ELECT Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |