AZ HB2200 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Technical correction; municipal platting
Title
Technical correction; municipal platting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-15 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-15 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-14 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-2-0-1-0-0) |
2022-02-15 | House | House COM Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-3-2-0-0-0) |
2022-02-14 | House | House read second time |
2022-02-10 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |