AZ HB2200 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - House TECH Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-1-0-0)
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - House TECH Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-1-0-0)
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriation; state aviation fund
Title
Appropriation; state aviation fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-05 - House - House Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | House | House TECH Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-1-0-0) |
2020-01-29 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to House TECH Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-01-13 | House | Prefile |