AZ HB2194 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-20 - Senate read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-20 - Senate read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Indoor tanning; minors; restricted use
Title
Indoor tanning; minors; restricted use
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House Health Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House Health Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate COMPS Committee |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate COMPS Committee |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-02-09 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (39-19-2-0) |
2017-02-07 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-07 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-06 | House | House consent calendar |
2017-02-06 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2017-01-26 | House | House HEALTH Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-0-1-0-0) |
2017-01-19 | House | House read second time |
2017-01-18 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-01-18 | House | Assigned to House HEALTH Committee |
2017-01-18 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |