AZ HB2192 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Chapter 183
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Chapter 183
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Child support; driver license restriction
Title
Child support; driver license restriction
Sponsors
Rep. Regina Cobb [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | Senate | Chapter 183 |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-04-18 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate TRANSIT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TRANSIT Committee |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-02-21 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-1-2-0) |
2017-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-15 | House | House JPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-01-18 | House | House read second time |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned to House JPS Committee |
2017-01-17 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Child Support
Department Of Economic Security
Department Of Transportation
Driver Licenses
Marital And Domestic Relations
Transportation
Department Of Economic Security
Department Of Transportation
Driver Licenses
Marital And Domestic Relations
Transportation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 517 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
25 | 518 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 3001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 3153 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 3159 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |