AZ HB2190 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-30 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Failed To Pass, voting: (13-16-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-30 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Failed To Pass, voting: (13-16-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Common core; replacement
Title
Common core; replacement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Failed To Pass, voting: (13-16-1-0) |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-2-0-0) |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Senate ED Committee |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2015-03-12 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-03-11 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (34-23-3-0) |
2015-03-10 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2015-02-24 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-24 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-23 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-1-0-2-0) |
2015-01-22 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | House ED Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-2-0-0-0) |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to House ED Committee |
2015-01-26 | House | House read second time |
2015-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-01-22 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2015-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |