AZ HB2184 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

At-risk youth; career, college readiness

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

At-risk youth; career, college readiness

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-23SenateSenate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0)
2017-02-28SenateSenate read second time
2017-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2017-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2017-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2017-02-27SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2017-02-23SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-02-22HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (52-7-1-0)
2017-02-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-02-15HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-15HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-15HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2017-01-30HouseHouse ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-4-0-2-0-0)
2017-01-18HouseHouse read second time
2017-01-17HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-01-17HouseAssigned to House ED Committee
2017-01-17HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15707New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/68677
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2184p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2184h.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/h.2184education.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/h.2184boyer.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68677&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68677&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68677&billStatusActionId=175531&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68677&billStatusActionId=175411&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68677&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2

Bill Comments

feedback