AZ HB2170 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-17 - Senate motion to reconsider third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-17 - Senate motion to reconsider third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Election mailings; third-party disclosures
Title
Election mailings; third-party disclosures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Senate | Senate motion to reconsider third reading |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (15-13-2-0) |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-02-22 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (32-27-1-0) |
2022-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-01 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-01 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-01-31 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-26 | House | House GE Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-6-0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-19 | House | House read second time |
2022-01-18 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Election Mailings
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Procedures
Registration Officers
Third-party Disclosures
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Procedures
Registration Officers
Third-party Disclosures