AZ HB2170 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Chapter 306
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Writs of garnishment; attorney fees

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Writs of garnishment; attorney fees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03SenateChapter 306
2021-05-03SenateGovernor Signed
2021-04-27SenateTransmitted to Governor
2021-04-26HouseTransmit to House
2021-04-26SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
2021-04-05SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2021-03-30SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-30SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-29SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-03-25SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2021-03-03SenateSenate read second time
2021-03-02SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-03-02SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2021-02-24SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-02-23HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (54-5-1-0)
2021-02-23HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2021-02-09HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-09HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-08HouseHouse consent calendar
2021-02-08HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-03HouseHouse JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-2-0-0-0-0)
2021-01-25HouseHouse read second time
2021-01-21HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-01-21HouseAssigned to House JUD Committee
2021-01-21HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
121572Amended CodeSee Bill Text
121574Amended CodeSee Bill Text
121580Amended CodeSee Bill Text
121591Amended CodeSee Bill Text
121598.03Amended CodeSee Bill Text
121598.04Amended CodeSee Bill Text
121598.07Amended CodeSee Bill Text
121598.10Amended CodeSee Bill Text
121598.12Amended CodeSee Bill Text
121598.15Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/74594
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2170p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2170h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/laws/0306.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/482444
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/483290
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/485509
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487807
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/489309
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74594&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74594&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74594&billStatusActionId=201298&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74594&billStatusActionId=201428&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74594&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74594&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74594&billStatusActionId=203525&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74594&billStatusActionId=203857&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback