AZ HB2170 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Senate JUD Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (2-5-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Senate JUD Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (2-5-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Anti-racketeering monies; police training
Title
Anti-racketeering monies; police training
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Thorpe [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (2-5-0-0) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-02-21 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (35-23-2-0) |
2017-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2017-02-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-20 | House | House consent calendar |
2017-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-15 | House | House JPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-2-0-0-0-0) |
2017-01-24 | House | House FPRPP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2017-01-18 | House | House read second time |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned to House FPRPP Committee |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned to House JPS Committee |
2017-01-17 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 2314.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 2314.03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |