AZ HB2158 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-13 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-13 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Court-ordered evaluations
Title
Court-ordered evaluations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate PS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-1-1-0) |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate PS Committee |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate PS Committee |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2013-03-01 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2013-02-28 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (55-1-4-0) |
2013-02-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2013-02-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2013-01-23 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-02-06 | House | House PSMRA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to House PSMRA Committee |
2013-01-24 | House | House read second time |
2013-01-23 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-01-23 | House | Assigned to House PSMRA Committee |
2013-01-23 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |