AZ HB2155 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Controlled substances; workers' compensation
Title
Controlled substances; workers' compensation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - House - House Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - House - House Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | Governor Signed | |
2012-03-29 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-03-29 | House final reading , voting: (54-0-6-0) | |
2012-03-29 | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2012-03-27 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-27 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-22 | Transmit to House | |
2012-03-22 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) | |
2012-03-21 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-03-06 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-06 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-05 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-02-14 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-21 | Senate BI Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-0-1-0) | |
2012-02-15 | Referred to Senate BI Committee | |
2012-02-15 | Senate read second time | |
2012-02-14 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-14 | Assigned to Senate BI Committee | |
2012-02-14 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2012-02-07 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-02-07 | House third reading PASSED voting: (54-2-3-0) | |
2012-01-30 | House Consent Calendar January 30, 2012 @ 4:00 PM | |
2012-01-31 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-01-31 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-01-30 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2012-01-11 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-01-25 | House HHS Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2012-01-11 | Referred to House HHS Committee | |
2012-01-18 | House BI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0-0) | |
2012-01-12 | Referred to House BI Committee | |
2012-01-12 | House read second time | |
2012-01-11 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-01-11 | Assigned to House HHS Committee | |
2012-01-17 | Assigned to House BI Committee | |
2012-01-11 | Introduced in House and read first time |