AZ HB2153 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Chapter 134
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Campaign finance; nonprofits; disclosure

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Campaign finance; nonprofits; disclosure

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-05SenateChapter 134
2018-04-05SenateGovernor Signed
2018-04-02SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-03-29HouseTransmit to House
2018-03-29SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (17-13-0-0)
2018-03-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2018-03-27SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-27SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-26SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-03-22SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2018-02-19SenateSenate read second time
2018-02-15SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-15SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-02-13SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-13HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (33-25-2-0)
2018-02-13HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-08HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2018-02-06HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-06HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-05HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-02-05HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0)
2018-01-30HouseHouse FPRPP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0)
2018-01-17HouseHouse read second time
2018-01-16HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-16HouseAssigned to House FPRPP Committee
2018-01-16HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16901Amended CodeSee Bill Text
16905Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69873
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2153p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2153h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0134.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69873&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69873&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69873&billStatusActionId=180597&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69873&billStatusActionId=180650&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69873&billStatusActionId=180655&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69873&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69873&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69873&billStatusActionId=182733&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69873&billStatusActionId=182794&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback