AZ HB2152 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Police; camera recordings; required redactions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Police; camera recordings; required redactions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
2021-03-16SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-16SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-15SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-03-11SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0)
2021-02-25SenateSenate read second time
2021-02-24SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-02-24SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2021-02-24SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2021-02-23SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-02-23HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-29-0-0)
2021-02-18HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2021-02-09HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-09HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-08HouseHouse consent calendar
2021-02-08HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-01HouseHouse MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-6-0-0-0-0)
2021-01-21HouseHouse read second time
2021-01-20HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-01-20HouseAssigned to House MAPS Committee
2021-01-20HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
381117New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/74571
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2152p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2152h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/s.2152rules.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/482014
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/482684
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/485503
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486777
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74571&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74571&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74571&billStatusActionId=200763&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74571&billStatusActionId=201348&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74571&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74571&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74571&billStatusActionId=204264&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments 750

feedback