AZ HB2152 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Chapter 176
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Chapter 176
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Fingerprinting; joint powers authority
Title
Fingerprinting; joint powers authority
Sponsors
Rep. Drew John [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House Local and International Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House Local and International Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | Senate | Chapter 176 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-04-05 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2018-04-05 | House | House concurs |
2018-03-27 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2018-03-27 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2018-03-26 | House | Transmit to House |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-02-08 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (52-5-2-0) |
2018-01-30 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-01-30 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-01-29 | House | House consent calendar |
2018-01-29 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0) |
2018-01-17 | House | House read second time |
2018-01-17 | House | House LIA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0-0-0) |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned to House LIA Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |