AZ HB2146 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Contracts; licensure requirements; exemption

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contracts; licensure requirements; exemption

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-05-21SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-05-21SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-05-20SenateSenate RULES Committee action: proper For Consideration with Recommendation for a Floor Amendment, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-03-21SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2019-03-11SenateSenate read second time
2019-03-07SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-03-07SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2019-03-07SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-02-26SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-02-26HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (32-28-0-0)
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-25HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-25HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-20HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-1-0-2-0-0)
2019-02-18HouseHouse RA Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-0-0-0-0)
2019-02-12HouseHouse COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0)
2019-01-29HouseHouse read second time
2019-01-28HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-01-28HouseAssigned to House RA Committee
2019-01-28HouseAssigned to House COM Committee
2019-01-28HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71238
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2146p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2146h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2146s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/h.2146weninger2.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/h.2146commerce.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/h.2146grantham.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/h.2146regulatory affairs.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.2146floormesnard.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71238&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71238&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71238&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71238&billStatusActionId=187028&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71238&billStatusActionId=187032&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71238&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71238&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#4
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71238&billStatusActionId=189726&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback